+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 Recommended Do Pass
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned