+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (22)
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0065
- Assigned Chapter Number 87
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0065
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0065
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- H Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0065
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Concurrence
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Placed on General File
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
- S Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 2019: H Concur:Passed 58-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 58
February 20, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
February 13, 2019: S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 5, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 59-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 30, 2019: H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-4-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Sweeney
Type:
Primary Sponsor