+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0059
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0059
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0059
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0059
- Adopted HB0025JC01
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted HB0025JC01
On February 13, 2009 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Did Not Concur
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 Recommended Do Pass
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
On January 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Do Pass
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 3, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor