+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H04 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned