+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction; No Further Action Prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
- H09 Recommended Do Pass
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned