+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Did Not Consider for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 54-6-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
- Received for Introduction
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
January 27, 2017: H03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3