+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Failed 3rd Reading
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H02
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Joint Appropriations Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor