+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0125
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0125
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0125
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0125
- Adopted HB0236JC001: 25-4-1-0-0
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted HB0236JC001: 45-13-2-0-0
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Concur:Failed 9-51-0-0-0
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 25-5-0-0-0
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rerefer to S02 - Appropriations
- S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 43-16-1-0-0
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
- H04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (34)
+ − Votes (15)
March 3, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 51
March 3, 2017: Adopted HB0236JC001
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2017: Adopted HB0236JC001
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
March 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
February 28, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 1
February 28, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 27, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2017: S02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 5
February 22, 2017: S04 - Education
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 7, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2017: 2nd Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Absent: 1
February 3, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
February 3, 2017: COW
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2017: H04 - Education
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
February 2, 2017: H02 - Appropriations
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
House Education Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor