+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0067
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0067
On February 28, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0067
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0067
- Did Concur
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- S08 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Rereferred to S02
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On January 27, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor