+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0047
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0047
On February 23, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0047
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0047
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Do Pass
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor