+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Failed CoW; Indef Postponed
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 29, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned