+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0120
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0120
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0120
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0120
- Adopted HB0231JC002: 25-1-4-0-0
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted HB0231JC002: 58-2-0-0-0
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to JR 2-1(c):S Appointed JCC02 Members
- Pursuant to JR 2-1(c): H Appointed JCC02 Members
- JCC Requested a New Committee to be Appointed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Appointed JCC01 Members
- Concur:Failed 29-31-0-0-0
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 57-2-1-0-0
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2017: Adopted HB0231JC002
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
March 3, 2017: Adopted HB0231JC002
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
February 24, 2017: Concur
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 31
February 22, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 10, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
February 3, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2017: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2