+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0092
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0092
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0092
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0092
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S09 Recommended Do Pass
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 Recommended Do Pass
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On January 17, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned