+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0077
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0077
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0077
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0077
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 21, 2017: S07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 2, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor