+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0017
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0017
On February 20, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0017
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0017
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S03 Recommended Do Pass
On January 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03
- Received for Introduction
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 2, 2008 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor