+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0100
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0100
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0100
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0100
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- S09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Rereferred to S02
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S09
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (6)
JD (SD02) Anderson
Type:
Primary Sponsor