+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
- COW
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 2, 2017: H09 - Minerals
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor