+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
- COW
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- :Rerefer to H07 - Corporations
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
February 2, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3