+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0073
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0073
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0073
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0073
- 3rd Reading:Passed 29-0-1-0-0
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
- Received for Introduction
On January 21, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2017: S10 - Labor
- Yeas: 5
January 31, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 26, 2017: H10 - Labor
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor