+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 12, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0031
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0031
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- S08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Do Pass
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor