+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0011
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0011
On February 29, 2008 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0011
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0011
- Did Concur
On February 27, 2008 in the House:
- Received for Concurrence
On February 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 21, 2008 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 Recommended Do Pass
On February 18, 2008 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 15, 2008 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2008 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 13, 2008 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
- Received for Introduction
On December 19, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Joint Transportation, Highways and Military Affairs Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor