+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- S:Died in Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
- No report prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S11 - Journal
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 36-22-2-0
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 5-2-0-0
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- COW:Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Judiciary:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 6-3-0-0
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
- Received for Introduction
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
February 3, 2015: Appropriations
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 30, 2015: Judiciary
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor