+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0085
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0085
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0085
On March 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0085
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Do Pass
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
- Received for Introduction
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Do Pass
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned