+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- S08 Motion to Do Pass Failed in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
- Received for Introduction
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned