+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0115
On February 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0115
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0115
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0115
- Did Concur
- Received for Concurrence
On February 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S02
- Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Do Pass
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H09 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H09
On January 15, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned