+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0015
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0015
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0015
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0015
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
- Received for Introduction
On November 30, 2012 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Joint Judiciary Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor