+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0005
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0005
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0005
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0005
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- S03 - Revenue:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Placed on General File
- COW:Passed
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 46-14-0-0-0
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 46-13-1-0-0
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 23, 2016: S03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 5
February 15, 2016: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 14
February 10, 2016: H03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 9
February 9, 2016: Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue 46-13-1-0-0
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Joint Revenue Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor