+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0011
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0011
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0011
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0011
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- S07 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
On January 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
- Received for Introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Joint Corporations, Elections and Political Subdivisions Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor