+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Failed 26-33-1-0-0
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Education:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
- Received for Introduction
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
February 5, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2015: Education
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3