+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- H COW:Failed 21-40-1-0-0
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
- H Introduced and Referred to H09 - Minerals
On January 21, 2023 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 2, 2023: H COW:Failed 21-40-1-0-0
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 40
January 30, 2023: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
January 27, 2023: H09 - Minerals:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 8-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Henderson
Type:
Primary Sponsor