+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0112
- Assigned Chapter Number 189
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0112
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Concurrence
- H Concur:Passed 54-4-2-0-0
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0112
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0112
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Laid Back
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S10 - Labor
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
- :Rerefer to H02 - Appropriations
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
- H Received for Introduction
- H Introduced and Referred to H10 - Labor
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2019: H Concur:Passed 54-4-2-0-0
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 4
February 25, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Passed 19-9-1-0-1
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 9
February 15, 2019: S10 - Labor:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 6, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 42-17-1-0-0
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 17
February 1, 2019: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 6-1-0-0-0
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
January 31, 2019: H10 - Labor:Recommend Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Barlow
Type:
Primary Sponsor