+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Failed Reconsideration
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Reconsideration Pending; H Failed 3rd Reading
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned