+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0074
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0074
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0074
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0074
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S06 Recommended Do Pass
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to S06
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned