+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0100
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0100
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0100
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0100
- 3rd Reading:Passed 21-9-0-0-0
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S04 - Education:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S04 - Education
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 56-4-0-0-0
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H04 - Education:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
- Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 9
February 22, 2017: S04 - Education
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
January 26, 2017: H04 - Education
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor