+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Died In Committee
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01; No Report Prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 16, 2007 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 12, 2007 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 10, 2007 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor