+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File; Did Not Consider in CoW
- S10 Recommended Do Pass
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S10
- Received for Introduction
On February 9, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on General File
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H10
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned