+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- H postponed indefinitely
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 2-6-1-0-0
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H04 - Education
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2019: H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 2-6-1-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 6
January 29, 2019: H04 - Education:Do Pass Failed 2-6-1-0-0
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Flitner
Type:
Primary Sponsor