+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number Chapter No. 109 Session Laws of Wyoming 2015
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0072
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0072
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0072
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0072
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 27-2-1-0-0
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 4-1-0-0-0
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-1-1-0-0
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-3-0-0-0
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
- Received for Introduction
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2015: Transportation
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
February 5, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2015: Transportation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor