+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- S:DO PASS FAILED in Accordance with Senate Rule 5-4: 1-4-0-0-0
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- No report prior to CoW Cutoff
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S03 - Revenue
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 42-18-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 28, 2017: S
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 4
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 42
- Nays: 18
January 27, 2017: H03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 9