+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 12, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0082
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0082
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0082
On March 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0082
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 27, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed CoW
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S02 Recommended Do Pass
On February 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- S08 Recommended Do Pass
- Placed on General File
- Rereferred to S02
On February 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08
- Received for Introduction
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 3, 2009 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2009 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H02 Recommended Amend and Do Pass
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rereferred to H02
- H08 Recommended Do Pass
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08
On January 15, 2009 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor