+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0028
- Assigned Chapter Number 32
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0028
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0028
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0028
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
- S COW:Passed
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0
On February 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 25, 2022 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 54-6-0-0-0
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 4, 2022 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (5)
March 7, 2022: S 3rd Reading:Passed 26-2-2-0-0
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 2
March 3, 2022: S08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 28, 2022: H 3rd Reading:Passed 53-6-1-0-0
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 6
February 22, 2022: H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 7-1-1-0-0
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
February 15, 2022: H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation 54-6-0-0-0
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 6
+ − Sponsor
Transportation
Type:
Primary Sponsor