+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0025
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0025
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0025
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0025
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed COW
- Placed on General File
- S07 Recommended Do Pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S07
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2014 in the House:
- Passed COW
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 Recommended Do Pass
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Joint Corporations, Elections and Political Subdivisions Interim Committee
Type:
Primary Sponsor