+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
- COW
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S08 - Transportation
- Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Do Pass 6-2-1-0-0
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2017: S08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 5
February 1, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
January 27, 2017: H08 - Transportation
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1