+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Did Not Consider in CoW
- COW
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H03 - Revenue:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 7-2-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H03 - Revenue
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
January 27, 2017: H03 - Revenue
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2