+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S05 - Agriculture
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 38-19-3-0-0
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H08 - Transportation
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 14, 2019: S 3rd Reading:Failed 14-16-0-0-0
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 16
February 8, 2019: S05 - Agriculture:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
February 1, 2019: H 3rd Reading:Passed 38-19-3-0-0
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 19
January 25, 2019: H08 - Transportation:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
MacGuire
Type:
Primary Sponsor