+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Returned Bill Pursuant to SR 5-4
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed CoW
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H01 Recommended Do Pass
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01
On January 15, 2013 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned