+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Became Law without Signature
- Assigned Chapter Number 167
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Concurrence
- H Concur:Passed 57-0-3-0-0
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0080
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0080
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0080
On April 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- S COW:Laid Back
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S07 - Corporations
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On March 3, 2021 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 27, 2021 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2021: H Concur:Passed 57-0-3-0-0
- Yeas: 57
April 2, 2021: S 3rd Reading:Passed 28-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 28
March 30, 2021: S07 - Corporations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 5
March 17, 2021: H 3rd Reading:Passed 58-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
March 5, 2021: H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
MacGuire
Type:
Primary Sponsor