+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0070
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0070
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0070
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0070
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 28-1-1-0-0
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- COW Passed
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 4-0-1-0-0
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 60-0-0-0-0
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- COW Passed
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H01 - Judiciary
- Received for Introduction
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 20, 2015: Judiciary
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
February 3, 2015: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 29, 2015: Judiciary
- Yeas: 9