+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Became Law without Governor's Signature
- Assigned Chapter Number 55
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- H Speaker Signed HEA No. 0025
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- S President Signed HEA No. 0025
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- H Concur:Passed 56-4-0-0-0
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0025
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Concurrence
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Passed
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- S 2nd Reading:Laid Back
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- S COW:Passed
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
- S Placed on General File
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Introduced and Referred to S02 - Appropriations
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- S Received for Introduction
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- H 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- H 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- H COW:Passed
On February 14, 2020 in the House:
- H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- H Placed on General File
On February 12, 2020 in the House:
- H Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 58-2-0-0-0
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- H Received for Introduction
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2020: H Concur:Passed 56-4-0-0-0
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
March 4, 2020: S 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 30
February 27, 2020: S02 - Appropriations:Recommend Amend and Do Pass 3-0-2-0-0
- Yeas: 3
February 19, 2020: H 3rd Reading:Passed 57-1-2-0-0
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
February 14, 2020: H02 - Appropriations:Recommend Do Pass 7-0-0-0-0
- Yeas: 7
February 12, 2020: H Introduced and Referred to H02 - Appropriations 58-2-0-0-0
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Cap Fin & Inv
Type:
Primary Sponsor