+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Chapter Number
- Governor Signed HEA No. 0078
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- President Signed HEA No. 0078
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker Signed HEA No. 0078
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned Number HEA No. 0078
- 3rd Reading:Passed 30-0-0-0-0
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- COW:Passed
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on General File
- S01 - Judiciary:Recommend Do Pass 5-0-0-0-0
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to S01 - Judiciary
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received for Introduction
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- 3rd Reading:Passed 53-4-3-0-0
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading:Passed
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- COW:Passed
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on General File
- H07 - Corporations:Recommend Do Pass 9-0-0-0-0
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to H07 - Corporations
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received for Introduction
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill Number Assigned
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 6, 2017: S01 - Judiciary
- Yeas: 5
January 27, 2017: 3rd Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
January 23, 2017: H07 - Corporations
- Yeas: 9